Washington Western District Court
Judge:Ricardo S Martinez
Case #: 2:25-cv-00845
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 25-00002-00395-8 SEA
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 12:09 PM PDT
Defendant
I.Q. Data International Inc
Represented By
Jeffrey I Hasson
Hasson Law, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Vintage at Urban Center, LLC
Represented By
Brian Allen Boice
Boice Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Oleksandr Lehonkov
Represented By
Boris Davidovskiy
Boris Davidovskiy, P.S.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 05/09 12:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal, by IQ Data International Inc.(Hasson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 05/09 12:11 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent TS Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Assurant, Inc., Other Affiliate American Bankers Insurance Group, Inc. for IQ Data International Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by IQ Data International Inc. (Hasson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
2 2 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Thu 05/08 8:56 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 05/08 8:54 AM
Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Thu 05/08 8:57 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendants IQ Data International Inc and Vintage at Urban Center LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/15/2025. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(HH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 05/07 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 25 2-00395 8 SEA; Related [+] filed by I.Q. Data International Inc.(Hasson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8965208
Att: 1 Consent,
Att: 2 Complaint,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Notice of Appearance,
Att: 5 Eservice of Notice of Appearance,
Att: 6 State Court Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 State Court Civil Case Schedule,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet