Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Karen K Caldwell
Case #: 5:25-cv-00164
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:1383 Review of HHS Decision
Case Filed:May 07, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 5:00 PM
ORDER: granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 05/8/2025. (DC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
3 3 socsec Standing Procedures Governing Social Security Actions Wed 05/07 4:33 PM
GENERAL ORDER 22-15: STANDING PROCEDURES GOVERNING FILINGS, BRIEFING, AND RESOLUTION OF ACTIONS: 1. An action is commenced upon filing of the complaint. 2. Clerk to notify Commissioner of Social Security and the U.S. Attorney via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). 3. Answer to the complaint must be served within 60 days of notice of the action as outlined in (2) above. 4. FRCP 12 motions due within 60 days of notice of action as outlined in (2) above. 5. Action is presented for decision by parties briefs. (a) Plaintiffs Brief is due 30 days after the answer is filed OR within 30 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion under paragraph (4) above. (b) Commissioners Brief due within 30 days after service of Plaintiffs Brief. (c) Plaintiff's Reply brief due within 14 days after service of Commissioners Brief. 6. Extensions of time, page limitations or permissions to file additional briefs may be granted for good cause shown. 7. Except as otherwise provided motion practice shall be governed by LR 7.1. 8. Clerk directed to file this General Order in all actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). 9. On December 1, 2022, this General Order shall supersede General Order 13-17. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves. CC: COR.(ADH)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/07 4:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elizabeth A. Perkins(ADH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/07 4:31 PM
COMPLAINT (No Process Necessary)., filed by Elizabeth A. Perkins.(ADH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Conflict Check Wed 05/07 4:35 PM
Conflict Check run. (ADH)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Wed 05/07 4:40 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elizabeth A. Perkins (ADH)
Related: [-]