Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Greg N Stivers
Referred: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Case #: 1:25-cv-00063
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1446nr Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Case in other court:Warren Circuit Court, 25-CI-00038
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 5:11 PM EDT
Defendant
Ashton B. Darnell
Represented By
Michelle Duncan
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Hillard
Represented By
Caleb T. Hanes
Morgan & Morgan - Bowling Green
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
8 8 3 pgs order Order Fri 05/09 2:46 PM
ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (EBOC) by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 5/9/2025. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling conference set for 6/26/2025 at 10:00 AM CDT/11:00 AM EDT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties by 6/5/2025. Rule 26 meeting report due by 6/19/2025. See Order for details. cc: counsel, HBB-CM (KDY)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent Fri 05/09 1:36 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and in accordance with Rule 73(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that a United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or non-jury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. You may consent to have your case referred to a Magistrate Judge, or you may withhold your consent without adverse consequences. Should all parties consent to having a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, please complete the[LINK:Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge] and send a copy of this document to the clerks office via regular mail or email at[LINK:intake-kywECF@kywd.uscourts.gov] . (TJD)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order - TEXT ONLY Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 05/09 1:35 PM
TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 5/9/2025; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 misc Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 05/08 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)); filed by Susan Hillard. (Hanes, Caleb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/07 4:06 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE to Warren Circuit Court and counsel/parties of record re1 Notice of Removal. (KDY)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 05/07 4:01 PM
Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)); filed by Ashton B. Darnell. (KDY)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assignment Wed 05/07 4:00 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (KDY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 05/07 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Ashton B. Darnell from Warren Circuit Court, case number 25-CI-00038. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-4243990) Notice to counsel: Pursuant to LR 81.1(a), the removing party must electronically file any portion of the state court record it considers relevant to the removed action that the removing party did not file at the time of removal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Pursuant to LR 81.1(b), any motion that remains pending in state court at the time of removal that the movant wishes the District Court to rule upon must be refiled in the District Court case within 14 days after removal. (KDY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Lower Court Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - RFAs to Plaintiff,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - P Responses to Darnell RFA,
Att: 4 Cover Sheet
answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/07 4:05 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (filed in Warren Circuit Court see DN1 -1) by Ashton B. Darnell. (KDY)
Related: [-]