Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Timothy L Brooks
Case #: 2:25-cv-02047
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:May 07, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
misc Clerk's Order of Judge Assignment Fri 05/09 9:31 AM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Timothy L. Brooks and Honorable Mark E. Ford, as the referral judge. (ria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Consent/Reassignment Thu 05/08 2:39 PM
REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by David A Morris. (McKinnon, Laura)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 9:43 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit and DIRECTING SERVICE on the Social Security Administration Commissioner and the US Attorney for the Western District/Arkansas via notice of electronic filing without prepayment of fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to note the date of service on the docket sheet. Further, the Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 8, 2025. (cla)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Magistrate Notice - SSA Thu 05/08 8:33 AM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 5/22/2025.(mbm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 12:46 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David A Morris. (McKinnon, Laura)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 05/08 12:45 AM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by David A Morris.(McKinnon, Laura)
Related: [-]
service Affidavit of Service as to USA Thu 05/08 9:57 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by David A Morris. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 5/7/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. (mjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 05/07 3:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by David A Morris. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (mbm)
Related: [-]