Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:25-cv-00526
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 5:09 PM CDT
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Co.
Plaintiff
Karen Jane Berson
Represented By
Christian Y. Cahill
The Law Office Of Christian Yale Cahill, PLLC
contact info
Dennis David Green, Jr
Law Office Of Dennis D Green Jr., P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Fri 05/09 11:16 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/9/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Wed 05/07 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 8/11/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Wed 05/07 4:22 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Wed 05/07 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Wed 05/07 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/07 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Co. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4318394), filed by Karen Jane Berson.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Declaration Page and Policy,
Att: 2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 05/07 4:24 PM
TX State Bar status verified as active for Dennis David Green, Jr admitted to this court . Local counsel secured. (kc)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 05/07 4:24 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Christian Y. Cahill admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]