New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nancy Hershey Lord
Case #: 1:25-bk-42218
Case Filed:May 07, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
202-204 Ocean Ave Holdings LLC
16 Court St Fl 28
Brooklyn, NY 11241-1028
Represented By
202-204 Ocean Ave Holdings LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 6:06 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 court Notice of Hearing of Defective or Deficient Filing of Non-Individual Chapter 11 Case Thu 05/08 2:32 PM
Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for Debtor's Failure to be Represented by Counsel.Hearing scheduled for 6/18/2025 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. . Chapter 11 Non-Individual Attorney Cure due by 5/22/2025. Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 202-204 Ocean Ave Holdings LLC
2 2 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Thu 05/08 9:32 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 929-2553, Participant Code 1576337, Enter # sign. (Khodorovsky, Nazar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Thu 05/08 3:08 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 5/7/2025.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 5/7/2025. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 5/7/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 5/7/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 5/7/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 5/21/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/21/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/21/2025. Schedule G due 5/21/2025. Schedule H due 5/21/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 5/21/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/21/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 5/21/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/21/2025. (las)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 05/07 3:06 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by 202-204 Ocean Ave Holdings LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 9/4/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 9/4/2025. (las)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto Wed 05/07 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00. Receipt Number 10336055. (GM) (admin)
Related: [-]