Arizona District Court
Judge:Krissa M Lanham
Case #: 2:25-cv-01546
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 5:04 PM MST
Defendant
BMW of North America LLC
Plaintiff
Ziv Memran
Represented By
Shalev Amar
Amar Law Group PLLC
contact info
Ryan Scott Lee
Amar Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 05/08 11:12 AM
ORDER - Both counsel and pro se litigants must abide by the Rules of Practice of the U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona ("Local Rules") and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this order on defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court. FURTHER ORDERED that, unless the Court orders otherwise, on August 4, 2025, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any defendant in the United States that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Krissa M Lanham on 5/8/2025. (NSH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 05/07 4:01 PM
Summons Issued as to BMW of North America LLC. (ALR)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Wed 05/07 4:00 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-24267551. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Krissa M Lanham. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-1546 KML. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ALR)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Wed 05/07 3:58 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Ziv Memran. (submitted by Ryan Lee) (ALR)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/07 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-24267551 filed by Ziv Memran. (Submitted by Ryan Lee)(ALR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet