Oregon District Court
Judge:Youlee Yim You
Case #: 3:25-cv-00770
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Case in other court:Multnomah Circuit Court, 25CV22066
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 5:05 PM PDT
Defendant
American Lumper Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Ozander Mathis


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Thu 05/08 8:55 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 9/5/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/6/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (rks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/07 5:27 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Lumper Services, LLC. (Crowhurst, Megan)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_sup Declaration Wed 05/07 5:22 PM
Declaration of Brian Goline in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal . Filed by American Lumper Services, LLC. Related [+] (Crowhurst, Megan)
Related: [-] Notice of Removal,1 .
2 2 oth_sup Declaration Wed 05/07 5:16 PM
Declaration of Megan J. Crowhurst in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal . Filed by American Lumper Services, LLC. Related [+] (Crowhurst, Megan)
Related: [-] Notice of Removal,1 .
Att: 1 Exhibit A
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 05/07 5:08 PM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 25CV22066 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9840894 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by American Lumper Services, LLC. (Crowhurst, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet