Washington Western District Court
Judge:Jamal N Whitehead
Case #: 2:25-cv-00850
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 5:06 PM PDT
Movant
Halima Magan Warsame
Mother and Next Friend for 2515 S 9TH STREET #2109
MINNEAPOLIS, MN 55406
Petitioner
Nur Sheikh-Elmi
241702677 NW DETENTION CENTER 1623 E. J STREET, SUITE 5
TACOMA, WA 98421
Respondent
Pamela Bondi
Represented By
US Attorney Habeas
contact info
Respondent
Northwest ICE Processing Center
Represented By
US Attorney Habeas
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
11 11 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Fri 05/09 5:56 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court ORDERS that Defendants and all their officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and persons acting in their behalf, in concert, or in participation with them are immediately enjoined from: (a) Removing or deporting Sheikh-Elmi from the United States; and (b) Transferring Sheikh-Elmi from the Northwest ICE Processing Center to any other facility during the pendency of these proceedings. Unless extended by the Court, this TRO expires 14 days from entry. Finally, Sheikh-Elmi has moved for a preliminary injunction. Dkt. No. 4. The Court ORDERS the Government to respond to the motion by May 16, and that Sheikh-Elmi may file a reply, if any, by May 21. signed by Judge Jamal N Whitehead.(ELS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
10 10 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Thu 05/08 9:36 AM
CORRECTED Notice of Filing Deficiency re Halima Magan Warsame re8 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter,. ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Submitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. A IFP Form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 6/9/2025 to correct IFP application (MIH)(cc: Movant Halima Magan Warsame with IFP Form via USPS)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice-Other Thu 05/08 9:34 AM
NOTICE OF INTENT TO OPPOSE re3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Respondent Pamela Bondi. (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
8 8 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Thu 05/08 9:28 AM
DISREGARD Notice of Filing Deficiency re Halima Magan Warsame ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Submitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. A IFP Form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 6/9/2025 to correct IFP application (MIH)(cc: Movant Halima Magan Warsame with IFP Form via USPS) Modified on 5/8/2025 Corrected Notice sent at10 to fix Movant's mailing address (MIH)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/08 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Respondent Pamela Bondi. (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Thu 05/08 9:15 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re Nur Sheikh-Elmi ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Form. See attached letter for more information and instructions. An IFP Form is attached for your convenience. Filer has until 6/9/2025 to correct IFP application (MIH)(cc: Petitioner with IFP Form via USPS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 05/07 5:25 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioner Nur Sheikh-Elmi, Movant Halima Magan Warsame. Noting Date 5/7/2025, (MIH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 05/07 5:24 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Petitioner Nur Sheikh-Elmi, Movant Halima Magan Warsame. Noting Date 5/7/2025, (MIH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 sealdoc Sealed Document Wed 05/07 5:22 PM
SEALED EXHIBIT A by Petitioner Nur Sheikh-Elmi, Movant Halima Magan Warsame re1 2241 Application. (MIH)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Application Wed 05/07 5:21 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Nur Sheikh-Elmi, Movant Halima Magan Warsame. (MIH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PROPOSED 2241 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus,
Att: 2 Second PROPOSED 2241 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus,
Att: 3 Third PROPOSED 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,
Att: 4 Cover Letter,
Att: 5 Email Transmission of Case 1,
Att: 6 Email Transmission of Case 2
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 05/07 4:39 PM
Judge Jamal N Whitehead added. Judge Marsha J. Pechman no longer assigned to case. (MIH)
Related: [-]