Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald M Middlebrooks
Case #: 9:25-cv-80553
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Case in other court:15th Judicial Circuit Court, 50-02025-CA-000025XXXAMB-AK
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 4:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Anna Goldman
Represented By
Nolan Thompson Greene
Law Offices Of James W. Kehoe, Iii
contact info
Plaintiff
Raffaele Bartolucci


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
3 3 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Wed 05/07 11:57 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney John Scott Keller has not been added to this case re1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) due to his membership status in this Courts Bar[LINK:https://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/flsd-bar-admission-status-and-admission-date-look] . (pt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 05/07 9:59 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (blc)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18426838, filed by Anna Goldman.(Greene, Nolan). No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 5/7/2025 (blc).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet JS044,
Att: 2 RPC Disclosure,
Att: 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure,
Att: 4 Summon(s) Lower Court Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 State Court Complaint,
Att: 6 Summon(s) Summons,
Att: 7 Summon(s) NOT of Service of INTS,
Att: 8 Summon(s) RFP,
Att: 9 Summon(s) Receipt,
Att: 10 Summon(s) Case Management Order,
Att: 11 Summon(s) Alias Summons,
Att: 12 Summon(s) AFF of Service,
Att: 13 Summon(s) Admin Receipt,
Att: 14 Summon(s) MET to Effect Service,
Att: 15 Summon(s) Order on MET to Effect Service,
Att: 16 Summon(s) Out of State AFF of Service