Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:F Kay Behm
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 4:25-cv-11331
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 12:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Jennifer Callaghan
Defendant
Jessica Kalmewicki
Defendant
Oakland County, Inc.
Defendant
Marla E. Parker
Plaintiff
Alvin Rice
38309 Southfarm Lane
Northville, MI 48167


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Thu 05/08 8:51 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (CShr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 notice Filing Fee Not Paid* Wed 05/07 10:43 AM
Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 5/21/2025 (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Wed 05/07 10:34 AM
State court documents by Alvin Rice [SUBMITTED THROUGH PRO SE PORTAL] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 05/07 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Alvin Rice against All Defendants [SUBMITTED THROUGH PRO SE PORTAL] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 State court dcoument