Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Case #: 1:25-cv-02502
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 12:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Asam Hotels Inc.
Defendant
Aspen Grand Hotels LLC
Defendant
Sarah Malik
Defendant
Sikandar A. Malik
Plaintiff
Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC
Represented By
Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLC
contact info
Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings Llp- Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Six Continents Hotels, Inc.
Represented By
Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLC
contact info
Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings Llp- Atl
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
10 10 service Return of Service Executed Mon 05/12 11:30 AM
Return of Service Executed by Six Continents Hotels, Inc., Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC. Sarah Malik served on 5/9/2025, answer due 5/30/2025. (Baroody, Anne)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Fri 05/09 11:50 AM
Return of Service Executed by Six Continents Hotels, Inc., Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC. Aspen Grand Hotels LLC served on 5/7/2025, answer due 5/28/2025. (Baroody, Anne)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Fri 05/09 11:49 AM
Return of Service Executed by Six Continents Hotels, Inc., Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC. Asam Hotels Inc. served on 5/7/2025, answer due 5/28/2025. (Baroody, Anne)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Return of Service Executed Fri 05/09 11:48 AM
Return of Service Executed by Six Continents Hotels, Inc., Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC. Sikandar A. Malik served on 5/8/2025, answer due 5/29/2025. (Baroody, Anne)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Fri 05/09 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re:2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2025 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
6 6 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 05/07 11:13 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Sarah Malik. (tcc)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 05/07 11:12 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Sikandar A. Malik. (tcc)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 05/07 11:12 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Aspen Grand Hotels LLC. (tcc)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 05/07 11:11 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Asam Hotels Inc.. (tcc)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 05/07 11:21 AM
Submission of2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
2 2 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 05/07 11:10 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc..(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/07 11:07 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Six Continents Hotels, Inc., Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14276171)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet