Amy Chavez v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02796 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 1:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Amy Chavez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 05/07 9:54 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 4/3/2025), Amy Chavez v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02796-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern District of California, San Diego (wmil, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil, ) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12366813.), filed by Amy Chavez. Service due by 7/2/2025(wmil, ) |