South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-02823
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 1:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Clariant Corp
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kidde PLC
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
3M Company
Plaintiff
Joseph Vander Linden
Represented By
Constantine Venizelos
Constant Legal Group LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Wed 05/07 12:43 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 4/4/2025), Joseph Vander Linden v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02823-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern District of Louisiana, New Orleans Division (wmil, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 05/07 12:42 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
1 1 39 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/07 12:41 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12369337.), filed by Joseph Vander Linden. Service due by 7/3/2025(wmil, )
Related: [-]