Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Jane Triche Milazzo
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:25-cv-00900
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 3:10 AM CDT
Defendant
Ochsner Clinic Foundation
Plaintiff
Majed Diab
Represented By
Christopher Minias
The Minias Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Fri 05/09 3:32 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Greg Gerard Guidry recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 5/9/2025.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Thu 05/08 8:46 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cmi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/07 7:49 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Ochsner Clinic Foundation (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10991365) filed by Majed Diab.Attorney Christopher Minias added to party Majed Diab(pty:pla).(Minias, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A- EEOC Charge,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B- EEOC Charge,
Att: 4 Summons Waiver of service