California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott H Yun
Case #: 6:25-bk-13004
Case Filed:May 07, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Fu Bang Group Corp, USA
4261 Odyssey Dr Unit 117
Corona, CA 92883-5629
Represented By
Derrick Talerico
Weintraub Zolkin Talerico & Selth LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago
Saturday, May 10, 2025
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 05/10 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Fu Bang Group Corp, USA
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 05/10 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Fu Bang Group Corp, USA
Thursday, May 08, 2025
4 4 misc Statement Thu 05/08 11:39 AM
Statement Statement Concerning Assignment of Case Filed by Debtor Fu Bang Group Corp, USA. (Talerico, Derrick)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Thu 05/08 10:13 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules /statements recorded as deficient. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. Related [+] (ET)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Fu Bang Group Corp, USA
2 2 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 05/08 9:01 AM
Notice of lodgment of Order in Bankruptcy Case Filed by Debtor Fu Bang Group Corp, USA Related [+]. (Talerico, Derrick)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Fu Bang Group Corp, USA List of Equity Security Holders due 05/21/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 05/21/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 05/21/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 05/21/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 05/21/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 05/21/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 05/21/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 05/21/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 05/21/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 05/21/2025. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 05/21/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 05/21/2025.
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
1 1 15 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 05/07 11:18 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Fu Bang Group Corp, USA List of Equity Security Holders due 05/21/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 05/21/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 05/21/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 05/21/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 05/21/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 05/21/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 05/21/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 05/21/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 05/21/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 05/21/2025. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 05/21/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 05/21/2025. (Talerico, Derrick)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 05/07 11:19 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:25-bk-13004] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58393932. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1