Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald M Middlebrooks
Case #: 1:25-cv-22124
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 State Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 08, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
7 7 12 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 05/09 5:04 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER THE PRISON LITIGATION REFORM ACT ("PLRA"). Amended Pleadings due by 6/9/2025. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/9/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Rights Complaint Form
6 6 notice Notice of Compliance Fri 05/09 9:31 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: copy of ECF No.5 mailed to Florida Department of Corrections, The Bureau of Finance and Accounting. (kma)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/09 9:28 AM
ORDER GRANTING3 PLAINTIFF IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND ESTABLISHING A DEBT OF $350. On or before JUNE 9, 2025, Plaintiff shall pay $59.83 as a partial filing fee in this case. Plaintiff need not prepay costs for service of process. Partial Filing Fee due by 6/9/2025. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/8/2025. See attached document for full details. (kma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
4 4 4 pgs order Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant Thu 05/08 3:10 PM
ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/8/2025. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 10:19 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricky Freeman. (kma)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Thu 05/08 10:17 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks (kma)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens Thu 05/08 10:11 AM
Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Centurion of Florida, R. Cruz-Gomez. Filing fee $ 405.00 (IFP Motion filed), filed by Ricky Freeman.(kma)
Related: [-]