Colorado District Court
Judge:Timothy P O'Hara
Case #: 1:25-cv-01446
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Case in other court:Boulder County District Court, 2025CV30195
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 11:09 AM MDT
Defendant
Dillon Companies, Inc.
Represented By
Ashley Ricketson Larson
Sutton Booker P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremiah Crawford


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
9 9 order Minute Order Fri 05/09 1:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 05/09/2025. The above captioned case has been directly assigned to Magistrate Judge O'Hara pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. The Parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form [ECF8 ] on or before July 16, 2025. The Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on July 30, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom C-402, on the fourth floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. It will be an in-person proceeding. No later than seven days before the Scheduling Conference, the Parties shall (1) file their Proposed Scheduling Order onto the case docket sheet and (2) submit the proposed Scheduling Order in Word format by joint email, copying all Parties, to Chambers at[LINK:o'hara_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] . (ggill, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
8 8 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Thu 05/08 10:28 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (agryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 05/08 10:28 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 05/08 10:27 AM
AFFIDAVITof Service of Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Summons- Defendant Dillon Companies, Inc. upon Dillon Companies, Inc on 04/17/2025.(agryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/08 10:25 AM
COMPLAINT against Dillon Companies, Inc., filed by Jeremiah Crawford.(agryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Thu 05/08 10:25 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (agryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Removal: Administrative Notices Thu 05/08 10:24 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (agryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/08 10:12 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Larson, Ashley)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 05/08 10:08 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DILLON COMPANIES, INC., d/b/a KING SOOPERS, INC. from Boulder County, Case Number 2025CV30195. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10325647), filed by DILLON COMPANIES, INC., d/b/a KING SOOPERS, INC..(Larson, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet