Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-46098

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Maria L Oxholm
Case #: 2:25-ap-04085
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
NLMK Pennsylvania LLC, Defendant
Represented By
NLMK Pennsylvania LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Newpoint Advisors Corporation, Plan Administrator of the Estate of Rapid Metals, LLC, Plaintiff
Represented By
Stuart C. Gaul, Jr
Bernstein-Burkley, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey Toole
Bernstein Burkley P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/13 9:39 AM
Summons Service Executed on NLMK Pennsylvania LLC 5/13/2025 (Toole, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/07 4:31 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Newpoint Advisors Corporation, Plan Administrator of the Estate of Rapid Metals, LLC. (Gaul, Stuart)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 05/07 2:28 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Plaintiff Newpoint Advisors Corporation, Plan Administrator of the Estate of Rapid Metals, LLC. (Toole, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 05/07 2:23 PM
Summons Issued on NLMK Pennsylvania LLC Answer Due 06/6/2025 (Toole, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/07 2:23 PM
Adversary case 25-04085 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Newpoint Advisors Corporation, Plan Administrator of the Estate of Rapid Metals, LLC against NLMK Pennsylvania LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. [Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550], (Toole, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summary of Transfers