District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Timothy J Kelly
Case #: 1:25-cv-01403
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:2271 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of the District of Columbia, 2025-CAB-001962
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 3:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Brendan F Boyle
1502 Longworth House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515
Defendant
Peter Ingle
1328 W Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Stephen R. Terrell
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Patricia M. Broullire
7512 Oldchester Road
Bethesda, MD 20817


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to Tue 05/13 3:57 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Notice of Removal and Motion to Dismiss by PATRICIA M. BROULLIRE.(Dolan, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/13 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Andrew Hill on behalf of PATRICIA M. BROULLIRE (Hill, Brian)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/13 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Louis E. Dolan, Jr on behalf of PATRICIA M. BROULLIRE (Dolan, Louis)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
6 6 misc Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents Mon 05/12 12:11 PM
Receipt on 5/12/2025 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2025-CAB-001962. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
5 5 order .Order Fri 05/09 2:04 PM
STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/9/2025. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel/Party Fri 05/09 12:51 PM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal,(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/09 12:47 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 05/08 2:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Terrell, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Clouse Declaration,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/08 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of United States as Defendant by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Terrell, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 05/08 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2025-CAB-001962 (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Brendan F Boyle, Peter Ingle.(Terrell, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Superior Court Documents Complaint,
Att: 2 Westfall Act Certification,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status Fri 05/09 12:30 PM
RESOLVED.....NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Terrell, Stephen). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 5/15/2025. (zhcn) Modified on 5/9/2025 (znmw)
Related: [-]