Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Case #: 0:25-cv-60907
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Case in other court:17th Judicial Circuit Court, CONO-25-020826
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 3:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
Jason Daniel Joffe
Squire Sanders & Dempsey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Davida Mitchell
Represented By
Ethan Brandon Babb
Ethan Babb Law Firm
contact info
Samantha R Wood
Ethan B. Babb PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
3 3 7 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Fri 05/09 12:24 PM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/19/2025. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/9/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 05/08 3:07 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (blc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Thu 05/08 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18433601, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Joffe, Jason). No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 5/8/2025 (blc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint & Other State Court Documents.