Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Younge
Case #: 2:25-cv-02358
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:May 08, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 05/14 11:07 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S4 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF EDWARD A. WICKLUND, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 5/14/25.5/14/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/13 3:10 PM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 5/13/25. 5/13/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 05/12 12:47 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID TO DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/12/25. 5/12/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent Mon 05/12 10:58 AM
Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by PAMELA K.M. PINKNEY.. (Parente, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 05/09 2:48 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Edward A. Wicklund, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18281371.) filed by PAMELA K.M. PINKNEY..(Parente, Andrea)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Social Security Notice of Case Assignment Fri 05/09 7:06 AM
Social Security Notice of Case Assignment(amas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CONSENT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 2:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by PAMELA K. PINKNEY..(Parente, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint (IFP or Government Plaintiff) Thu 05/08 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by PAMELA K. PINKNEY.(Parente, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Case Management Tracking,
Att: 3 Designation Form