California Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas S Hixson
Case #: 3:25-cv-04016
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 1:07 PM PDT
Defendant
Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Defendant
Wells Fargo & Company's Group Disability Income Plan
Plaintiff
Russel Witte
Represented By
Bennett Matthew Cohen
Law Offices Of Bennett M. Cohen
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Saturday, May 10, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Sat 05/10 6:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Wells Fargo & Company's Group Disability Income Plan. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Sat 05/10 6:26 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 05/08 1:42 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 05/08 1:08 PM
Proposed Summons. (Cohen, Bennett)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/08 1:04 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR FAILURE TO PAY BENEFITS DUE UNDER THE PLAN AND FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES (29 U.S.C. SECTIONS 1001 and 1132) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20655640.). Filed by Russel Witte. (Cohen, Bennett)
Related: [-]