Mississippi Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jason D Woodard
Case #: 1:25-bk-11479
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Claims Deadline:Sep 05, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Webb Family Medical Clinic, PLLC
1140 E Wellsgate Dr
Oxford, MS 38655-5951
Represented By
Craig M. Geno
Law Offices Of Craig M. Geno, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
501 East Court Street, Suite 6-430
Jackson, MS 39201


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Saturday, May 10, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Service Sat 05/10 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Service No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Service Sat 05/10 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Service No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Service Sat 05/10 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Service No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, May 09, 2025
13 13 order Directing Appointment of Ombudsman Fri 05/09 2:15 PM
Order Directing US Trustee to Appoint an Ombudsman . Entered on Docket by: (SI)
Related: [-]
utility Clerk's Notice of Adjustment Fri 05/09 9:17 AM
Clerk's Notice of Adjustment - Mailing address has been updated to match the Voluntary Petition. Related [+]. Entered on Docket by: (EL)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Webb Family Medical Clinic, PLLC
Thursday, May 08, 2025
12 12 court Notice of Status Conference (Ch 11 Subchapter V) Thu 05/08 4:40 PM
Notice of Status Conference Re: Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case. Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 6/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Oxford Federal Building. Pre-Status Report Due By 5/28/2025. Entered on Docket by: (MDH)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Webb Family Medical Clinic, PLLC
11 11 order Segregate Tax Deposits Thu 05/08 4:31 PM
Order for Segregation of Tax Deposits. . Entered on Docket by: (MDH)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Notice of Deficiency Thu 05/08 4:28 PM
Order and Notice of Deficiency in Re: . SB Balance Sheet Due: 5/22/2025.SB Statement of Operations Due 5/22/2025.SB Cash Flow Statement Due 5/22/2025. Deficiency or Objection to Case Dismissal due by 5/22/2025. Entered on Docket by: (MDH)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury Thu 05/08 2:23 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property - Non-Individual. , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims - Non-Individual. , Schedule G: Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual- Codebtors Filed by Craig M. Geno on behalf of Webb Family Medical Clinic, PLLC. (Geno, Craig)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Thu 05/08 2:21 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Craig M. Geno on behalf of Webb Family Medical Clinic, PLLC. (Geno, Craig)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Small Business Federal Tax Return Thu 05/08 2:21 PM
Small Business Federal Tax Return 2023 Filed by Craig M. Geno on behalf of Webb Family Medical Clinic, PLLC. (Geno, Craig)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Thu 05/08 2:20 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Craig M. Geno on behalf of Webb Family Medical Clinic, PLLC. (Geno, Craig)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Thu 05/08 2:20 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Craig M. Geno on behalf of Webb Family Medical Clinic, PLLC. (Geno, Craig)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Equity Security Holders Thu 05/08 2:19 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Craig M. Geno on behalf of Webb Family Medical Clinic, PLLC. (Geno, Craig)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 05/08 2:19 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Craig M. Geno on behalf of Webb Family Medical Clinic, PLLC. (Geno, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Creditor Matrix Thu 05/08 2:18 PM
Creditor Matrix, Verification of Matrix Filed by Craig M. Geno on behalf of Webb Family Medical Clinic, PLLC. (Geno, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 05/08 2:16 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Chapter 11 Small Business/Subchapter V Plan Due by 08/6/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/4/2025. Non-Government Proofs of Claims due by 9/5/2025. (Geno, Craig)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 05/08 2:17 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-11479 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A11605779, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]