California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:25-cv-04024
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 2:08 PM PDT
Defendant
Coinbase, Inc.
430 California Street
San Francisco, CA 94104
Plaintiff
Ryan Cordero
Represented By
Jennifer Lauren Joost
Kessler Topaz Meltzer And Check LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick B. Goodwin
Represented By
Jennifer Lauren Joost
Kessler Topaz Meltzer And Check LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Henry Hobson, III
Represented By
Jennifer Lauren Joost
Kessler Topaz Meltzer And Check LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Johnson
Represented By
Jennifer Lauren Joost
Kessler Topaz Meltzer And Check LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/09 11:56 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Coinbase, Inc.. (Chang, Esther)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Compel Fri 05/09 11:51 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Coinbase, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 5/23/2025. Replies due by 5/30/2025.(Walker, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 15 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 16 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 17 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit 18 J. Nacoste Declaration,
Att: 20 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings
13 13 misc Statement Fri 05/09 11:42 PM
Statement Defendant's Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Coinbase, Inc.. (Walker, Nathan)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 05/09 11:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Matthew Liscovitz on behalf of Coinbase, Inc. (Liscovitz, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 05/09 11:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Matthew Ohlheiser on behalf of Coinbase, Inc. (Ohlheiser, Matthew)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 05/09 11:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Esther Kim Chang on behalf of Coinbase, Inc. (Chang, Esther)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 05/09 11:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Nathan Loy Walker on behalf of Coinbase, Inc. (Walker, Nathan)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 05/09 11:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Bree Hann on behalf of Coinbase, Inc. (Hann, Bree)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 05/09 11:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by William Fred Norton on behalf of Coinbase, Inc. (Norton, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 05/08 3:00 PM
Summons Issued as to Coinbase, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 05/08 2:57 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2025 08:30 AM in San Francisco - To be held by Zoom.(dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 05/08 2:03 PM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 05/08 1:55 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Ryan Cordero, Patrick B. Goodwin, Henry Hobson, III, Christopher Johnson (Joost, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 05/08 1:52 PM
Proposed Summons. (Joost, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/08 1:47 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action against Coinbase, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20656061.). Filed by Christopher Johnson, Ryan Cordero, Henry Hobson, III, Patrick B. Goodwin.(Joost, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D