District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Dabney L Friedrich
Case #: 1:25-cv-01405
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 5:08 PM EDT
Defendant
ROBERT F. KENNEDY, JR.
Defendant
ANGIE SALAZAR
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Plaintiff
LEO B.
Represented By
David Hinojosa
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Plaintiff
IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER
Represented By
David Hinojosa
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Plaintiff
XAVIER L.
Represented By
David Hinojosa
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Plaintiff
EDUARDO M.
Represented By
David Hinojosa
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELICA S.
Represented By
David Hinojosa
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Plaintiff
LIAM W.
Represented By
David Hinojosa
National Center For Youth Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 23, 2025
21 21 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 05/23 4:58 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ROBERT F. KENNEDY, JR, ANGIE SALAZAR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Vick, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Toby Biswas,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Thursday, May 22, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/22 11:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay M. Vick on behalf of ROBERT F. KENNEDY, JR, ANGIE SALAZAR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Vick, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Sealed Document Thu 05/22 5:14 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by LEO B., IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER, XAVIER L., EDUARDO M., ANGELICA S., LIAM W.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Wroe, Mishan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplemental Declaration of Angelica S.,
Att: 2 Declaration of Angelica S.,
Att: 3 Declaration of Eduardo M.,
Att: 4 Declaration of Liam W.,
Att: 5 Declaration of Leo B.,
Att: 6 Declaration of Xavier L.,
Att: 7 Declaration of Deisy S.,
Att: 8 Declaration of Rosa M.,
Att: 9 Declaration of Sofia W.,
Att: 10 Declaration of Ximena L.,
Att: 11 Declaration of J.E.D.M.
18 18 misc Sealed Document Thu 05/22 5:02 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by LEO B., IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER, XAVIER L., EDUARDO M., ANGELICA S., LIAM W.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Wroe, Mishan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mishan Wroe,
Att: 2 Previously filed Exhibit to Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed by Pseudonym
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/22 4:56 PM
NOTICE Re: Court's May 16, 2025 Order by LEO B., IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER, XAVIER L., EDUARDO M., ANGELICA S., LIAM W.(Wroe, Mishan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Previously filed Motion to Proceed by Pseudonym,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Previously filed Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Previously filed Proposed Order
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/22 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Diane DE Gramont on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DE Gramont, Diane)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/22 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mishan Wroe on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wroe, Mishan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
14 14 order .Order Tue 05/20 4:55 PM
STANDARD ORDER in Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 20, 2025 (lcdlf3)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 05/20 9:24 AM
SUMMONS (5)Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/20 9:19 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
order .Order Tue 05/20 2:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a scheduling conference on May 20, 2025, at 3:30 p.m. by telephone. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 20, 2025. (lcdlf2)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/20 3:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice;4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice;5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions.] So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 20, 2025. (lcdlf2)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/20 4:12 PM
Minute Entry for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/20/2025 before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich: Responses due by 5pm on 5/23/2025. Replies due by 3pm on 5/27/2025. Motion Hearing, re:10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, set for 5/30/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 24A (In Person) before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Court Reporter: Sara Wick. (smc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/20 4:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER. As discussed during the scheduling conference held on May 20, 2025, the Court GRANTS the defendants' unopposed12 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the defendants shall respond to the plaintiffs'10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before 5:00 p.m. on May 23, 2025. Any reply in support of the10 Motion shall be filed on or before 3:00 p.m. on May 27, 2025. A hearing will be held at 9:00 a.m. on May 30, 2025, if the Court does not issue a ruling on the10 motion before then. In addition, the defendants shall file an opposition to the plaintiffs'9 Motion for Class Certification on or before June 3, 2025. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 20, 2025. (lcdlf2)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/16 10:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ROBERT F. KENNEDY, JR, ANGIE SALAZAR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Parascandola, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/16 9:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Parascandola on behalf of All Defendants (Parascandola, Christina)
Related: [-]
order Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 05/16 7:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs'2 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym and to File Under Seal. Given the expedited nature of this matter, it determines that a full Opinion is not practical at this time. Believing that Plaintiffs have made the required showing on the relevant factors, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The2 Motion is GRANTED, subject to any further consideration by the United States District Judge to whom this case is randomly assigned; 2) All parties shall use the pseudonyms listed in the Complaint in all documents filed in this action; 3) All documents containing personally identifying information shall be filed under seal, with a redacted public filing made simultaneously or promptly thereafter; and 4) Within fourteen days of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file on the public docket: i) A pseudonymous version of their2 Motion and any attachments as a Notice to the Court; and ii) A sealed declaration containing their real names and residential addresses. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on May 16, 2025. (lcjeb3)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
10 10 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 05/09 6:51 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LEO B., IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER, XAVIER L., EDUARDO M., ANGELICA S., LIAM W..(Hinojosa, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit List,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1A,
Att: 6 Exhibit 1B,
Att: 7 Exhibit 1C,
Att: 8 Exhibit 1D,
Att: 9 Exhibit 1E,
Att: 10 Exhibit 1F,
Att: 11 Exhibit 1G,
Att: 12 Exhibit 1H,
Att: 13 Exhibit 2,
Att: 14 Exhibit 3,
Att: 15 Exhibit 4,
Att: 16 Exhibit 5
9 9 3 pgs motion Certify Class Fri 05/09 5:40 PM
MOTION to Certify Class by LEO B., IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER, XAVIER L., EDUARDO M., ANGELICA S., LIAM W..(Hinojosa, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit List,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5,
Att: 9 Exhibit 6,
Att: 10 Exhibit 7,
Att: 11 Exhibit 8,
Att: 12 Exhibit 9,
Att: 13 Exhibit 10,
Att: 14 Exhibit 11,
Att: 15 Exhibit 12
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/09 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Skye Perryman on behalf of LEO B., IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER, XAVIER L., EDUARDO M., ANGELICA S., LIAM W. (Perryman, Skye)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/09 2:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cynthia Liao, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11680430. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LEO B., IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER, XAVIER L., EDUARDO M., ANGELICA S., LIAM W..(McElvain, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/09 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joel L. McElvain on behalf of LEO B., IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER, XAVIER L., EDUARDO M., ANGELICA S., LIAM W. (McElvain, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 5:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Neha Desai, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11677770. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LEO B., IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER, XAVIER L., EDUARDO M., ANGELICA S., LIAM W..(Hinojosa, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Declaration Neha Desai,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 5:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Diane de Gramont, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11677739. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LEO B., IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER, XAVIER L., EDUARDO M., ANGELICA S., LIAM W..(Hinojosa, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 5:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mishan Wroe, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11677713. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LEO B., IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER, XAVIER L., EDUARDO M., ANGELICA S., LIAM W..(Hinojosa, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
2 2 motion Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym Thu 05/08 4:55 PM
SEALED MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by LEO B., IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER, XAVIER L., EDUARDO M., ANGELICA S.(Hinojosa, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 49 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/08 4:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11677464) filed by LIAM W., EDUARDO M., LEO B., ANGELICA S., XAVIER L., IMMIGRANT DEFENDERS LAW CENTER.(Hinojosa, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons HHS,
Att: 3 Summons Robert F. Kennedy Jr,
Att: 4 Summons Angie Salazar,
Att: 5 Summons U.S. Attorney General,
Att: 6 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office D.C.