New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:25-cv-03860
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 5:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Hippers.co
Plaintiff
Dreams USA, Inc.


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
17 17 16 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 05/09 4:47 PM
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER AUTHORIZING BIFURCATED AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE; ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY; ORDER RESTRAINING DEFENDANTS MERCHANT WEBSITE AND FINANCIAL ASSETS; ORDER PERMITTING THE SEIZURE OF DEFENDANTS COUNTERFEIT AND INFRINGING MERCHANDISE; ORDER SETTING BOND; AND ORDERING DEFENDANT TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE. Hippers.co shall show cause as to why a preliminary injunction, pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1116, 15 U.S.C. § 1125(c)(1), N.Y. Gen. Bus. Law § 360-l, and Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a), should not be issued enjoining Defendant as set forth in the order and pending the final hearing and determination of this action. A show cause hearing will be held on May 21, 2025, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Show Cause Response due by May 16, 2025. Reply due May 20, 2025. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/9/2025) (jar)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Proposed Order Fri 05/09 3:48 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Dreams USA, Inc...(Rogowski, Laurel)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/09 1:55 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dreams USA, Inc...(Rogowski, Laurel)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Fri 05/09 1:53 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Rogowski, Laurel)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney Fri 05/09 1:50 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Rogowski, Laurel)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/09 1:09 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Paige A. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dreams USA, Inc. . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dreams USA, Inc...(Jones, Paige) Modified on 5/9/2025 (bc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - NY Third Department,
Att: 4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - NDNY
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 05/09 9:19 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hippers.co..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 05/09 9:07 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 05/09 9:07 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 05/09 9:08 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 05/09 9:08 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Laurel M. Rogowski. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient AO 120/121 Form Fri 05/09 9:08 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT TRADEMARK FORM. Notice to Attorney Laurel M. Rogowski to RE-FILE Document No. 5 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is not correct; do not use the sample form.. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient AO 120/121 Form Fri 05/09 9:08 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Laurel M. Rogowski to RE-FILE Document No. 6 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):. the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 121 Copyright form is not correct; do not use the sample form. Re-file the document using the event type AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 121 Copyright PDF form. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Fri 05/09 11:36 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. 7 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 05/09 2:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Ex Parte Telephone Conference held on 5/9/2025. Plaintiff's counsel present. Plaintiff's application for a temporary retraining order is granted. Plaintiff was directed to submit a revised proposed order to show cause. (jar)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/09 3:06 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice re: Document No. 12 MOTION for Paige A. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dreams USA, Inc.. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee was not paid;.. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (bc)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Due Fri 05/09 3:07 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee Due: for12 MOTION for Paige A. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dreams USA, Inc. . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(bc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Fri 05/09 4:16 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document No. 16 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (nd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
10 10 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 05/08 9:43 PM
DECLARATION of Alan D. Buff in Support re:8 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Dreams USA, Inc...(Rogowski, Laurel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Buff Exh. A - SONNY ANGEL Images,
Att: 2 Exhibit Buff Exh. B - SMISKI Images,
Att: 3 Exhibit Buff Exh. C - HIPPERS Images,
Att: 4 Exhibit Buff Exh. D - NYT Article,
Att: 5 Exhibit Buff Exh. E - Vox Article,
Att: 6 Exhibit Buff Exh. F - Trademark Registrations,
Att: 7 Exhibit Buff Exh. G - Copyright Registrations,
Att: 8 Exhibit Buff Exh. H - Hippers.co Images,
Att: 9 Exhibit Buff Exh. I - Pop Up Shop Advertisement,
Att: 10 Exhibit Buff Exh. J - Purchase Receipt
9 9 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 05/08 9:29 PM
DECLARATION of Craig M. Scott in Support re:8 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Dreams USA, Inc...(Rogowski, Laurel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Registration Information
8 8 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 05/08 9:22 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by Dreams USA, Inc...(Rogowski, Laurel) ( Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing. )
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief Thu 05/08 9:20 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Dreams USA, Inc...(Rogowski, Laurel)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Thu 05/08 6:15 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Rogowski, Laurel)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs misc AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney Thu 05/08 6:14 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Rogowski, Laurel)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/08 6:12 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hippers.co, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dreams USA, Inc...(Rogowski, Laurel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/08 6:08 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dreams Inc. (Japan) for Dreams USA, Inc.. Document filed by Dreams USA, Inc...(Rogowski, Laurel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 05/08 6:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rogowski, Laurel)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/08 6:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Hippers.co. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31054789)Document filed by Dreams USA, Inc...(Rogowski, Laurel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6