Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Colin Stirling Bruce
Referred: Eric I Long
Case #: 2:25-cv-02135
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 5:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Plaintiff
Maranda Hansbro
1845 N. Oakcrest Avenue
Decatur, IL 62526


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/16 4:21 PM
NOTICE: proposed summons by Plaintiff Maranda Hansbro (RES)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/16 4:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Maranda Hansbro. Responses due by 5/30/2025 (RES)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 05/09 8:52 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/9/2025. Plaintiff filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed without Payment of Fees2 . Plaintiff used the form for the circuit court in Illinois. The Court directs the Clerk to provide Plaintiff with this Court's form. Plaintiff is granted leave to fill out that form, in its entirety, within 21 days. Also, to be considered, Plaintiff must supply the Court with a completed summons for Defendant. The Court directs the Clerk to provide Plaintiff with the summons form. Plaintiffs current Motion2 is denied. (RES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 4:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Maranda Hansbro. Responses due by 5/22/2025 (RES)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/08 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC, filed by Maranda Hansbro.(RES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM 285