Hansbro v. Experian Information Solutions Inc
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Colin Stirling Bruce |
Referred: | Eric I Long |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02137 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 5:06 PM CDT |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Maranda Hansbro
1845 N. Oakcrest Avenue
Decatur, IL 62526 |
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Proposed Summons by Maranda Hansbro. (BL) |
|
3 | 3
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Maranda Hansbro. Responses due by 5/30/2025. (BL) |
|
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 05/09 10:48 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/9/2025. Plaintiff filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed without Payment of Fees2 . Plaintiff used the form for the circuit court in Illinois. The Court directs the Clerk to provide Plaintiff with this Court's form. Plaintiff is granted leave to fill out that form, in its entirety, within 21 days. Also, to be considered, Plaintiff must supply the Court with a completed summons for Defendant. The Court directs the Clerk to provide Plaintiff with the summons form. Plaintiff's current Motion2 is denied. (BL) |
||
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Maranda Hansbro. Responses due by 5/22/2025. (BL) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions Inc, filed by Maranda Hansbro.(BL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |