Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Colleen R Lawless
Case #: 4:25-cv-04094
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 08, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 misc Remark Fri 05/09 3:54 PM
Remark: Blank IFP form. (VH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 motion Request Counsel Thu 05/08 4:22 PM
MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Augueste Burton. Responses due by 5/22/2025 (VH)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Opening Thu 05/08 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colleen Lawless. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Springfield Division, 600 E Monroe, Springfield, IL 62701. Merit Review Deadline set for 5/28/2025.(VH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Privacy
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/08 4:19 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Augueste Burton.(VH)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 05/08 4:26 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colleen R. Lawless on 5/8/2025. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $405 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $405 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(VH)
Related: [-]