California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:25-cv-04029
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Case in other court:ACIMOVIC, ALEKSANDAR v. MACY'S, 3:25-mc-80105
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 4:09 PM PDT
Defendant
Macy's, Inc.
Represented By
Halley Beth Thiel
Zelms Erlich Lenkov
contact info
Plaintiff
ALEKSANDAR ACIMOVIC


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/14 6:46 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aleksandar Acimovic.. (Lieberman, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 05/14 6:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Richard Michael Lieberman on behalf of Aleksandar Acimovic (Lieberman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 05/12 7:17 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 05/08 3:17 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 05/08 2:40 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Macy's, Inc. . (Thiel, Halley)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 05/08 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa Superior. Their case number is C2401150. (). Filed by Macy's, Inc..(Thiel, Halley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 05/08 3:15 PM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number ACANDC-20652896. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
respoth Answer to Removal Complaint Mon 05/12 7:11 PM
Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No.1 -2) by Macy's, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]