Delaware District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-00567
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1782 Letter rogatory - appointment
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 12:40 AM EDT
Petitioner
Zetwerk India Manufacturing Businesses Private Limited
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Lyons
Baker & Hostetler
contact info
Respondent
Ayr Energy, Inc.


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Thu 05/08 1:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Application for an Order Pursuant to Section 1782 to Conduct Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding served on Ayr Energy, Inc. c/o VCorp Agent Services, Inc. on May 8, 2025, filed by Zetwerk India Manufacturing Businesses Private Limited. (Lyons, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 misc Declaration Thu 05/08 9:36 AM
DECLARATION of John Tharian Thaliath re1 Application for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 to Take Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings by Zetwerk India Manufacturing Businesses Private Limited.(mrr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
3 3 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 05/08 9:31 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re1 Application for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 to Take Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings filed by Zetwerk India Manufacturing Businesses Private Limited.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/21/2025. (mrr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 05/08 9:28 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mrr)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs motion Letters Rogatory Thu 05/08 9:28 AM
Application for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 to Take Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings (Filing fee $ 405, ADEDC-4681517) - filed by Zetwerk India Manufacturing Businesses Private Limited.(mrr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed Thu 05/08 9:38 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Petitioner: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (mrr)
Related: [-]
service No Summons Issued Thu 05/08 9:39 AM
No Summons Issued. (mrr)
Related: [-]