Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Referred: Catherine M Salinas
Case #: 1:25-cv-02503
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 12:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Aldridge Pite Haan, LLP.
Defendant
Asset Acceptance, LLC
Plaintiff
Omolola Winfunke
Represented By
Margaret Lynne Kinnear
Atlanta Legal Aid Society, Inc.-Atl
contact info
Donald Maurice Coleman
Atlanta Legal Aid Society, Inc.-Atl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
7 7 misc Leave of Absence Fri 05/09 3:59 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 26-July7 2025, by Margaret Lynne Kinnear. (Kinnear, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
6 6 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 05/08 2:20 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Aldridge Pite Haan, LLP. (cpp)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 05/08 2:19 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Asset Acceptance, LLC. (cpp)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/08 2:15 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omolola Winfunke. (cpp)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Thu 05/08 2:13 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Omolola Winfunke.(cpp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 1 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 2:12 PM
ORDER GRANTING1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 5/8/2025. c:Financial Office(cpp)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 05/08 9:01 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 9:01 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Omolola Winfunke.(jbu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Certificate of Interested Parties,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet