New York Northern District Court
Judge:Mae A D'Agostino
Referred: Daniel J Stewart
Case #: 1:25-cv-00576
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 12:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Citizens Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Leah N. Jacob
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sylvie McKeever
Plaintiff
E.R.
Plaintiff
J.R.
Plaintiff
Lisa Walsh


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
7 7 motion Pre-Motion Letter Request Wed 05/14 6:23 PM
Pre-Motion Letter by Citizens Bank, N.A. requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino. MAD Pre-Motion Response Deadline 5/19/2025 (Jacob, Leah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Admission Requirement Thu 05/08 5:23 PM
NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Lisa Walsh, E.R. and J.R.; Attorney William V. O'Leary, Email address is wvolatty@yahoo.com. Phone number is (518) 463-9284. Admissions due by 5/22/2025. Notice sent via email to counsel.(mmg)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice Regarding Judge D'Agostino Case Disposition Pilot (Text-Only) Thu 05/08 5:19 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf . (mmg)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Thu 05/08 5:18 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/24/2025 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/17/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Sent Via email to counsel not admitted. (mmg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 05/08 5:24 PM
***Answer due date updated for Citizens Bank, N.A. answer due 5/14/2025. (mmg)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Thu 05/08 5:38 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #3 Answer: Clerk Erroneously uploaded document missing a page. Clerk has re-uploaded the document with all pages. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/08 5:12 PM
ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Sylvie McKeever.(mmg). (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/8/2025) (mmg, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc State Court Complaint Thu 05/08 5:09 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to#1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiffs in State of New York Supreme Court County of Albany. (mmg)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 05/08 5:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of New York Supreme Court County of Albany, case number 912386-24 (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-7125893) filed by Lisa Walsh, J.R., E.R..(mmg, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: State court Summons with Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Notice of Appearance,
Att: 3 Exhibit C: State Court Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D: Stipulation,
Att: 5 Exhibit E: Verified Answer,
Att: 6 Exhibit F: Consent to Removal,
Att: 7 Exhibit G: Notice of filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet