Gary O. Williams v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02842 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 12:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions, LP
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Nation Ford Chemical Company 2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Company, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
12321 Hatcherville Road
Baytown, TX 77521 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus, Inc.
180 Etowah Trace
Fayetteville, GA 30214 |
|
Plaintiff
Gary O. Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 05/08 9:12 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 4/4/2025), Gary O. Williams v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02842-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern District of Michigan (jdal) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jdal) |
|
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12369433.), filed by Gary O. Williams. Service due by 7/3/2025 (jdal) |