South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-02853
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 12:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Clariant Corp
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kidde PLC
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
3M Company
Plaintiff
Dan Davis
Represented By
Constantine Venizelos
Constant Legal Group LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Thu 05/08 8:19 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 4/4/2025), Dan Davis v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02853-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: District Court for the State of Colorado, Denver Division (wmil, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 05/08 8:18 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
1 1 39 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/08 8:17 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12369527.), filed by Dan Davis. Service due by 7/3/2025(wmil, )
Related: [-]