Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 1:25-cv-00685
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Terminated:May 13, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 12:08 AM CDT
Petitioner
Heritier Twizere
A#217158824 BlueBonnet Detention Center 400 2nd St.
Anson, TX 79501
Respondent
Kristi Noem
Respondent
Marcello Villegas
Represented By
Mary F. Kruger
United States Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/13 3:11 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (dm)
Related: [-]
misc Acknowledgment of District Case Transfer Thu 05/15 11:08 AM
Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Northern District of Texas, Abilene Division as case number 1:25-cv-00077. (dm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 misc Case Opening Letter Thu 05/08 5:05 PM
Case Opening Letter to Heritier Twizere. (cr5)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
2 2 misc Supplement to Thu 05/08 5:04 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Heritier Twizere.(cr5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, May 05, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 05/08 4:55 PM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 2441), filed by Heritier Twizere.(cr5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Envelope
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/08 4:57 PM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Thu 05/08 4:58 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell. (cr5)
Related: [-]