Texas Western District Court
Judge:Jason K Pulliam
Case #: 5:25-cv-00508
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Terminated:May 14, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
5 5 order Judgment Wed 05/14 3:17 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (vl)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 05/14 3:16 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE-- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Dionne Johnsons § 2254 petition (ECF No. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust state remedies. This Court DENIES Petitioner a certificate of appealability. See Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing § 2254 Proceedings; and all remaining motions, if any, are DENIED, and this case is now CLOSED.. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (vl)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/09 5:48 PM
Text Order GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. The U.S. Clerk is directed to accept Petitioner's 28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody (ECF No. 1) without prepayment of the required $5.00 filing fee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg5)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 misc Case Opening Letter Thu 05/08 3:06 PM
Case Opening Letter to Dionne Johnson. (tt)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 3:00 PM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dionne Johnson. (tt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 05/08 2:59 PM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Dionne Johnson..(tt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Copy of Envelope