Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy B Vitter
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:25-cv-00897
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 4:12 AM CDT
Defendant
Tess H Champagne
Defendant
Timothy P Champagne
Defendant
Michael Frost
Defendant
Magnolia Utility's Operators
Defendant
STAT Group
Defendant
William D Underwood
Plaintiff
Brett Eugene Champagne
4241 Hwy 1
Raceland, LA 70394


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 misc 1 - Notice of Deficient Filing Thu 05/08 10:04 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 5/29/2025. (cf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Application First Page
Monday, May 05, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 8:26 AM
***DEFICIENT*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brett Eugene Champagne. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (cf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/08 8:24 AM
COMPLAINT against STAT Group, Tess H Champagne, Timothy P Champagne, Michael Frost, Magnolia Utility's Operators, William D Underwood filed by Brett Eugene Champagne.(cf) edit docket text on 5/8/2025 (cf). Modified text on 5/8/2025 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet