Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Susie Morgan
Referred: Eva J Dossier
Case #: 2:25-cv-00919
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 4:12 AM CDT
Defendant
Sextant Stays, Inc.
Sher Garner 909 Poydras Street Ste.2800
New Orleans, LA 70112
Represented By
Ryan O'Neil Luminais
Sher, Garner, Cahill, Richter, Klein & Hilbert, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Quarter Holdings, LLC


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
10 10 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Fri 05/16 5:46 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sextant Stays, Inc. (Luminais, Ryan)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/16 5:02 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Sextant Stays, Inc. re6 MOTION to Expedite Emergency Motion to Maintain Summary Proceeding and for Expedited Trial Date on Complaint for Eviction or, Alternatively, for Remand .(Luminais, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Revenue Share Agreement
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/14 2:37 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Sextant Stays, Inc. file an opposition to Plaintiff's6 Motion to Expedite Hearing on or before Friday, May 16, 2025. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/14/2025.(pp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
7 7 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Tue 05/13 4:03 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Quarter Holdings, LLC (Cerise, Jason)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Expedite Tue 05/13 11:05 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Emergency Motion to Maintain Summary Proceeding and for Expedited Trial Date on Complaint for Eviction or, Alternatively, for Remand by Quarter Holdings, LLC.(Cerise, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/13 10:56 AM
MOTION to Maintain Summary Proceeding and for Expedited Trial Date on Complaint for Eviction or, Alternatively, for Remand by Quarter Holdings, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/4/2025.(Cerise, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission
Monday, May 12, 2025
4 4 order Text Order Mon 05/12 11:40 AM
TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1, nongovernmental corporate parties must file a disclosure statement with their first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. IT IS ORDERED that any nongovernmental corporate parties in this matter file the required disclosure statement within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Submitted Fri 05/09 9:16 AM
Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Luminais, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Fri 05/09 8:33 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier. (cc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 05/08 11:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2025-04278 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10993190) filed by Sextant Stays, Inc..Attorney Ryan O'Neil Luminais added to party Sextant Stays, Inc.(pty:dft).(Luminais, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Notice of Removal List of Parties and Pleadings