Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:S Thomas Anderson
Referred: Jon A York
Case #: 1:25-cv-02123
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 10:03 PM CDT
Defendant
MG Construction Company, LLC
Represented By
Catherine Karczmarczyk
Baker Donelson
contact info
Defendant
Shadow Creek West Partners
Represented By
Catherine Karczmarczyk
Baker Donelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Mario Reed
Calhoun & Associates 1595 N. Central Expressway
Richardson, TX 75080
Represented By
Matthew Todd Sandahl
M. Todd Sandahl, Attorney At Law
contact info
Eric G. Calhoun
Calhoun & Associates
contact info

GPO May 08 2025
ORDER OF TRANSFER to Eastern Division of the Western District of Tennessee at Jackson. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/8/2025. (shl)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
20 20 notice Setting Letter Mon 05/12 1:00 PM
SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2025 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
19 19 utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 05/08 12:29 PM
Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham no longer assigned to case. (jae)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order of Transfer Thu 05/08 10:04 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER to Eastern Division of the Western District of Tennessee at Jackson. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/8/2025. (shl)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 05/08 9:40 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference via Teams held on 5/8/2025. Eric Calhoun and Matthew Todd Sandahl appearing for the Plaintiff. Catherine Karczmarczyk appearing for the Defense. This matter was inadvertently filed in the Western (Memphis) Division. The Court will enter an order transferring the case to the Eastern (Jackson) Division. (Court Reporter: Tina Gibson) (btg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
16 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Proposed Joint Standard Track Scheduling Order . (Calhoun, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
15 15 SETTING LETTER: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure has been SET for THURSDAY, MAY 8, 2025 at 9:30 A.M. before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams Video. A link to the video conference will be emailed to the attorneys prior to the setting. If the parties consent to have the case heard by the magistrate, please file your consent and this conference will be cancelled. Counsel should be prepared to discuss all pending motions. PLEASE REVIEW THE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] . The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . (mmm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
14 14 Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman added. (jae)
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): The Scheduling Conference currently set for Thursday, May 15, 2025 at 2:15 PM via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Thomas L. Parker has been cancelled.(smm)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 04/11/2025. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Thursday, May 15, 2025 at 2:15 PM via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Thomas L. Parker. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order to ECF_Judge_Parker@tnwd.uscourts.gov at least seven (7) days before the scheduling conference. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions.(smm)
Related: [-]
10 10 ANSWER to1 Complaint Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by All Defendants.(Karczmarczyk, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 Summons Issued as to MG Construction Company, LLC and Shadow Creek West Partners. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service.(cmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
8 8 NOTICE of Summons by Eric G. Calhoun on behalf of Mario Reed. (Calhoun, Eric)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Summons by Eric G. Calhoun on behalf of Mario Reed. (Calhoun, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Todd Sandahl on behalf of Mario Reed (Sandahl, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
2 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4608262), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Calhoun, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet