Arizona District Court
Judge:Scott H Rash
Case #: 4:25-cv-00192
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 8:01 PM MST
Defendant
Walter Borda Bonilla
Defendant
Elena Garcia
Defendant
Luis Gonzales
Defendant
Luis Eduardo Quintero Herrera
Plaintiff
Fernando Medina
6001 E Pima St., Apt 228
Tucson, AZ 85712


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, May 08, 2025
10 10 misc Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Thu 05/08 5:03 PM
NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (DLV)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc New Case Opened Thu 05/08 5:02 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott H Rash. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-00192 TUC-SHR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLV)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 5:01 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Fernando Medina. (DLV)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Complaint Thu 05/08 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Fernando Medina.(DLV)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Case Thu 05/08 4:57 PM
ORDER denying1 MOTION to Seal Case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of Court shall unseal the case and file the lodged documents (Docs. 2, 3) in the public docket. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 5/7/2025. (DLV)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
5 5 SEALED NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (cc: Plaintiff) (DLV)
Related: [-]
4 4 *SEALED NOTICE: This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott H Rash. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-00192 TUC-SHR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (cc: plaintiff) (DLV) *Modified on 5/1/2025 to add judge to case number (DLV).
Related: [-]
3 3 FILED AT DOC.8 by Order doc.6 ----SEALED LODGED Proposed Application to Proceed Informa Pauperis re:1 MOTION to Seal Case. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Fernando Medina. (DLV) Modified on 5/8/2025 (DLV).
Related: [-]
2 2 FILED AT DOC.7 by Order doc.6 ----SEALED LODGED Proposed Complaint. re:1 MOTION to Seal Case. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Fernando Medina. (DLV) Modified on 5/8/2025 (DLV).
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by Fernando Medina. (DLV)
Related: [-]