California Central District Court
Judge:Serena R Murillo
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:25-cv-00915
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Terminated:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 1:15 AM PDT
Defendant
All Unknown Occupants
Defendant
Jie Chen
7 Inglenook
Irvine, CA 92602
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Jin Ling Wei
Represented By
Kelvin J Lo
Lo And Lo LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
9 9 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Fri 05/09 4:56 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court - Central Justice Center. Case number: 30-02025 01462953-CL-UD-CJC. (jp)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/09 4:52 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) by Judge Serena R. Murillo DENYING REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis3 . This case is REMANDED to State Court as explained in the attached statement. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 05/08 10:09 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Serena R. Murillo. (mku)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 05/08 7:24 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 05/08 7:24 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 05/08 7:23 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Serena R Murillo and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 7:13 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by Defendant Jie Chen. (car)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 05/08 7:10 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jie Chen (car)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 05/08 7:04 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-02025 01462953-CL-UD-CJC with Conformed copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Serena R. Murillo, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott, filed by Defendant Jie Chen. (car)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 05/08 9:07 AM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jin Ling Wei, upon Defendant All Unknown Occupants served on 3/19/2025, answer due 4/9/2025. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy. Submitted with Exhibit 2 pg 81 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 05/08 9:12 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jin Ling Wei, upon Defendant Jie Chen served on 3/19/2025, answer due 4/9/2025 in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Submitted with Exhibit 2 pg 83 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]