California Central District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00115
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Terminated:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 12:35 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John D. Ellis
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Manuel Boror-Cheley (1)
Terminated: 04/15/2025
Represented By
Luisa Patricia Tamez
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 2:47 AM PDT
Sunday, March 30, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Manuel Boror-Cheley in violation of 8:1326(a) Illegal Alien Found in the United States Following Deportation or Removal. Approved by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym as to Manuel Boror-Cheley (1). (mhe) [5:25-mj-00160-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Manuel Boror-Cheley (mhe) [5:25-mj-00160-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
4 4 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Manuel Boror-Cheley; defendants Year of Birth: 1980; date of arrest: 3/28/2025 (mat) [5:25-mj-00160-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym as to Defendant Manuel Boror-Cheley. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Contested detention hearing held. Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Luisa Patricia Tamez for Manuel Boror-Cheley, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders defendant permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 5/6/2025 10:00 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Court Smart: 3/31/25. (mat) [5:25-mj-00160-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF PRETRIAL DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym as to Defendant Manuel Boror-Cheley. (mat) [5:25-mj-00160-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing WAIVED and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Manuel Boror-Cheley is directed to appear and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 5/6/25 at 10:00 A.M. before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (mat) [5:25-mj-00160-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Manuel Boror-Cheley. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (mat) [5:25-mj-00160-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS filed by Defendant Manuel Boror-Cheley (mat) [5:25-mj-00160-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of a Preliminary Hearing by Defendant Manuel Boror-Cheley. (mat) [5:25-mj-00160-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Manuel Boror-Cheley. (mat) [5:25-mj-00160-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
12 12 INFORMATION filed as to Manuel Boror-Cheley (1) count(s) 1. Offense occurred in San Bernardino. (jb)
Related: [-]
13 13 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA John D. Ellis as to Defendant Manuel Boror-Cheley; defendants Year of Birth: 1980 (jb)
Related: [-]
14 14 PLEA AGREEMENT filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Manuel Boror-Cheley (jb)
Related: [-]