New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00221
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 4:53 AM EDT
Defendant
SEBASTIAN AREVALO (1)
Represented By
MICHAEL J. PAPPA
Rudnick, Addonizio, Pappa & Comer, PC
contact info
Notice Only
MARIBEL PEREZ
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
SEAN NADEL
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 6:54 AM EDT
Monday, June 24, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to TRAVIS JON ARNOLD (1), SEBASTIAN AREVALO (2). (tjg, ) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
Arrest of SEBASTIAN AREVALO (tjg, ) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor:Initial Appearance as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO held on 6/26/2024 (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tjg, ) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
13 13 CJA 20 as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO: Appointment of Attorney MICHAEL J. PAPPA for SEBASTIAN AREVALO.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/26/24. (tjg, ) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
14 14 Brady ORDER as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/26/24. (tjg, ) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO (2) 100,000.00 UNSECURED (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/26/24. (tjg, ) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
16 16 UNSECURED Bond Entered as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO in amount of $ 100,000.00, (tjg, ) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO Time excluded from 6/26/24 until 8/26/24.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/26/24. (tjg, ) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
19 19 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO Time excluded from 8/23/24 until 10/26/24.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/23/24. (tjg, ) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
20 20 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO Time excluded from 10/21/24 until 1/10/25.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/21/24. (tjg, ) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
23 23 Petition for Action and ORDER as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO. Bail review hearing to be set.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/6/24. (tjg, ) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
24 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Docket Call as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO held on 12/16/2024. No appearance by Defendant. Ordered an arrest warrant be issued for Defendant to appear for plea. Plea hearing adjourned. (Court Reporter Shannan Gagliardi (609-815-2750).) (jab) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
26 26 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO Time excluded from 1/10/2025 until 3/10/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/10/2025. (qa, ) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
27 27 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO Time excluded from 3/5/2025 until 6/10/2025.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/5/2025. (qa, ) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
Arrest of SEBASTIAN AREVALO (jem) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
28 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Hearing on Petition (Docket Entry No.23 ) for action on condition of Pretrial Release as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO held on 3/7/2025. Bail revoked. Ordered defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals. (jem) [2:24-mj-09209-CLW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
29 29 INFORMATION as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO (1) count 1. (jab)
Related: [-]
30 30 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by SEBASTIAN AREVALO. (jab)
Related: [-]
31 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Initial Appearance and Plea Agreement Hearing as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO held on 4/9/2025. Guilty Plea entered by SEBASTIAN AREVALO (1) as to Count 1 of the Information. Sentencing set for 9/10/2025 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5W before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Defendant remanded. (Court Reporter Shannan Gagliardi (609-815-2750).) (jab)
Related: [-]
32 32 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO. (jab)
Related: [-]
33 33 PLEA AGREEMENT as to SEBASTIAN AREVALO. (jab)
Related: [-]