California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:25-cv-03985
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Case in other court:San Francisco County Superior Court, CGC-25-623871
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 8:02 PM PDT
Defendant
Aramark Services, Inc.
Represented By
Sarah L. Zenewicz
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sabrina Myra Goodall
Represented By
Daniel Ginzburg
Frontier Law Center
contact info
Emanuel M Starr
Frontier Law Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 05/08 6:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aramark Services, Inc. re 5 Case Assigned by Intake,,6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, (Zenewicz, Sarah)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 05/08 9:43 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (kam2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 05/08 7:42 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aramark Services, Inc. re3 Certificate of Interested Entities,2 Request for Judicial Notice,1 Notice of Removal, (Zenewicz, Sarah)
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aramark Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Aramark, Corporate Parent Aramark Intermediate Holdco Corp. for Aramark Services, Inc.. (Zenewicz, Sarah)
Related: [-]
2 2 Request for Judicial Notice re1 Notice of Removal, filed byAramark Services, Inc.. Related [+] (Zenewicz, Sarah)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-25-623871. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20652003). Filed by Aramark Services, Inc..(Zenewicz, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Other Case-Initiating Documents Served by Plaintiff,
Att: 3 Declaration of Roxanne Tucker in Support of Notice of Removal of Defendant Aramark Services, Inc.