Washington Western District Court
Judge:John H Chun
Case #: 2:25-cv-00861
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 2:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Tom Cole
Defendant
Susan Collins
Defendant
Mike Johnson
Defendant
John Thune
Defendant
Donald Trump
Plaintiff
Eric J Kikkert
E-filing/Service 19115 112 AVE NE APT 426
BOTHELL, WA 98011


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
9 9 respm Declaration Fri 05/09 11:21 AM
DECLARATION of Exhibits for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Eric J Kikkert re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Kikkert, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
8 8 misc Praecipe-Other Thu 05/08 5:29 PM
PRAECIPE by Plaintiff Eric J Kikkert(Kikkert, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended signature page for Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 2 Amended signature page for Declaration in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 3 Amended signature page for Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
7 7 notice Notice re Pro Se Registration Thu 05/08 4:34 PM
NOTICE: Plaintiff Eric J Kikkert has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (LH)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 05/08 2:55 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants cc Plaintiff via email and USPS. (HH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons USAO for WAWD,
Att: 2 Summons Donald Trump,
Att: 3 Summons John Thune,
Att: 4 Summons Mike Johnson,
Att: 5 Summons Susan Collins,
Att: 6 Summons Tom Cole
5 5 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Thu 05/08 2:44 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. ***Action Required*** Improper/Missing Signature. See attached letter for more information and instructions. cc Plaintiff via USPS and email. (HH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 misc Praecipe for a Summons Thu 05/08 2:30 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Eric J Kikkert (HH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons AG DOJ,
Att: 2 Summons AG WAWD,
Att: 3 Summons Donald Trump,
Att: 4 Summons John Thune,
Att: 5 Summons Mike Johnson,
Att: 6 Summons Tom Cole
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 05/08 2:26 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Eric J Kikkert. Noting Date 5/8/2025, (HH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration In Support of Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 2 Memo In Support of Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 3 Proposed Order for Temporary Restraining Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/08 2:08 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) to be issued) Related [+] filed by Eric J Kikkert.(HH)
Related: [-] ceipt # 200007516
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F Page 1,
Att: 9 Exhibit F Page 2,
Att: 10 Exhibit G,
Att: 11 Exhibit H,
Att: 12 Exhibit I,
Att: 13 Exhibit J,
Att: 14 Exhibit K,
Att: 15 Exhibit L,
Att: 16 Exhibit M,
Att: 17 Exhibit N,
Att: 18 Email Transmittal