Washington Western District Court
Judge:David G Estudillo
Case #: 3:25-cv-05392
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 2:15 AM PDT
Defendant
The CBE Group Inc
Plaintiff
Christopher C Johnson
5613 121ST ST CT E UNIT 1
PUYALLUP, WA 98373


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
4 4 misc Letter Thu 05/08 3:20 PM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (MDH) (cc:Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Letter Thu 05/08 10:58 AM
DISREGARD filed in error LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (MDH) Modified on 5/8/2025 (MDH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
1 1 motion Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 10:22 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge David W. Christel filed by Christopher Charles Johnson.(MDH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Transmittal Email