Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Kai N Scott
Case #: 2:25-cv-02373
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 12:07 PM EDT
Defendant
MATTRESS FIRM, INC.
Plaintiff
GARY LEE PHILLIPS
Represented By
ARI RISSON KARPF
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/20 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LEANNE LANE COYLE on behalf of MATTRESS FIRM, INC. with Certificate of Service(COYLE, LEANNE)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/16 11:54 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GARY LEE PHILLIPS. MATTRESS FIRM, INC. waiver sent on 5/9/2025, answer due 7/8/2025. (KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 05/09 1:23 PM
Summons Issued as to MATTRESS FIRM, INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/9/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Fri 05/09 1:10 PM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 05/09 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT against MATTRESS FIRM, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18280200.), filed by GARY LEE PHILLIPS.(KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]