Delaware District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-00574
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Case in other court:North Carolina Middle, 1:25-cv-00090
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 1:07 PM EDT
Defendant
THE MARENA GROUP, LLC
Plaintiff
MCMURRAY FABRICS, INC.


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
20 20 misc Local Counsel Letter Fri 05/09 1:35 PM
Local Counsel Letter sent to Nathaniel J. Pencook, Thomas M. Van Camp, and David A. Luzum. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/9/2025. (mpb)
Related: [-]
19 19 transfer Case Transferred In from other District - Case Opening Event Fri 05/09 12:50 PM
Record of case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number in Other District: 1:25-cv-00090. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Fri 05/09 11:49 AM
ORDER signed by DISTRICT JUDGE THOMAS E. JOHNSTON on 5/9/2025; Because transferring this matter is proper pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a), Defendant's motion is GRANTED. (ECF No.15 .) The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to counsel of record and any unrepresented party. Also before the Court is Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss. (ECF No.10 .) This motion is DENIED AS MOOT. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
17 17 ORDER AND NOTICE signed by DISTRICT JUDGE THOMAS E. JOHNSTON on 4/11/2025; that the following dates are hereby fixed as the time by or on which certain events must occur as set out herein. Telephonic Scheduling Conference on 5/30/2025 at 2:00 p.m., before the undersigned, unless canceled. (sh) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Set Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2025 02:00 PM before DISTRICT JUDGE THOMAS E. JOHNSTON. (sh) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
16 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Alternative filed by THE MARENA GROUP, LLC - Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by MCMURRAY FABRICS, INC.. Replies due by 4/9/2025 (PENCOOK, NATHANIEL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
15 15 RESPONSE - Plaintiff's Response Consenting to Transfer of Venue filed by Plaintiff MCMURRAY FABRICS, INC. re8 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by THE MARENA GROUP, LLC filed by MCMURRAY FABRICS, INC.. Replies due by 4/9/2025 (PENCOOK, NATHANIEL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
14 14 DESIGNATION OF A UNITED STATES JUDGE FOR SERVICE WITHIN THE CIRCUIT. Pursuant to the authority vested in me by Title 28, United States Code, Section 292(b), I do hereby designate and assign the Honorable Thomas E. Johnston to perform the duties of district judge in the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina for the period of January 1, 2025, through June 30, 2025, and for such time as needed in advance to prepare and thereafter as required to complete unfinished business in the matters. Signed on 10/23/2024 by Chief Judge Albert Diaz, U. S. Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit. (Powell, Gloria) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Case Reassigned to DISTRICT JUDGE THOMAS E. JOHNSTON. JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. no longer assigned to the case. (Powell, Gloria) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
13 13 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. on 3/5/2025; that Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, (Doc.12 ), is GRANTED and Plaintiff shall have to and including March 26, 2025, to file responses to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue and Alternative Motion to Dismiss. (Docs.8 ,10 .) (sh) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Motion Submitted:12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 MOTION to Transfer Case ,10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Alternative to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. (km) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
12 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 MOTION to Transfer Case ,10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Alternative by MCMURRAY FABRICS, INC..(PENCOOK, NATHANIEL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
11 11 Defendant's Supporting BRIEF re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Alternative . (LUZUM, DAVID) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Alternative by THE MARENA GROUP, LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/5/2025 (LUZUM, DAVID) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
9 9 Defendant's Supporting BRIEF re8 MOTION to Transfer Case . (LUZUM, DAVID) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION to Transfer Case by THE MARENA GROUP, LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/5/2025 (LUZUM, DAVID) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
7 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney THOMAS M. VAN CAMP on behalf of Plaintiff MCMURRAY FABRICS, INC. (VAN CAMP, THOMAS) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
6 6 Notice of Right to Consent. (sh) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
5 5 Summons Issued as to THE MARENA GROUP, LLC. (State Court documents originally filed in Moore County Superior Court, file number 24CV002784-620, issued 12/13/2024, listed as Exhibit A to the1 Petition for Removal.) (sh) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against THE MARENA GROUP, LLC filed by MCMURRAY FABRICS, INC. (State Court documents originally filed in Moore County Superior Court, file number 24CV002784-620, listed as Exhibit A to the1 Petition for Removal.) (sh) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Marena Group Holding Company for The Marena Group, LLC.. (LUZUM, DAVID) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 DECLARATION re1 Petition for Removal by Defendant The Marena Group, LLC.(LUZUM, DAVID) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
1 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Moore County Superior Court, file number 24CV002784-620, against MCMURRAY FABRICS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-4013530.), filed by The Marena Group, LLC.(LUZUM, DAVID) Modified on 2/5/2025 to add State Court information. (sh) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (sh) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (sh) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 5/9/2025.]
Related: [-]